RI H7121 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/11/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/11/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- STATE TAX OFFICIALS - Limits the assessment of interest to 4 calendar years prior to the date on which notice of the delinquent payment is sent to the taxpayer.
Title
Limits the assessment of interest to 4 calendar years prior to the date on which notice of the delinquent payment is sent to the taxpayer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7121.pdf |