RI H7177 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SOLEMNIZATION OF MARRIAGES - Allows Michael Cervullo, Jr., to join Jillian Cervullo and Tyler Shemick in marriage on or about June 8, 2024, within the Town of North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Title
Allows Michael Cervullo, Jr., to join Jillian Cervullo and Tyler Shemick in marriage on or about June 8, 2024, within the Town of North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Special Legislation: Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Special Legislation: Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Special Legislation: Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Special Legislation: Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/04/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | House | House read and passed |
2024-01-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/23/2024) |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |