RI H7198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS' BILL OF RIGHTS - Repeals the law enforcement officers' bill of rights, chapter 42-28.6 of the general laws, in its entirety.
Title
Repeals the law enforcement officers' bill of rights, chapter 42-28.6 of the general laws, in its entirety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2024) |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS' BILL OF RIGHTS
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS' BILL OF RIGHTS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7198.pdf |