RI H7209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals 3/1/22 sunset provision allowing Class B/brew pub licensees to sell wine/beer/mixed drinks with food takeout orders only.
Title
Manufacturing And Wholesale Licenses -- Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee on Small Business: Passage of Sub A (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee on Small Business: Passage of Sub A (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-02-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-02-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/10/2022) |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-02-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/08/2022) |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |