RI H7341 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that commencing with the graduating class of 2022 all high school students attending public schools demonstrate proficiency in computer science.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7341.pdf |