RI H7399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires food service establishments to add an additional warning to their menus relative to food allergens and impose a penalty upon those establishments for failure to include the warnings on its menus. Failure to comply shall result in fines.
Title
Food Allergy Awareness In Food Service Establishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 15 N: 45 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 15 N: 45 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-04-26 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |