RI H7509 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES - Provides that gift certificates issued by state-chartered institutions of higher education would be exempt from the provisions of the gift certificate statute relating to expiration, escheatment, reissuance and refund.
Title
Provides that gift certificates issued by state-chartered institutions of higher education would be exempt from the provisions of the gift certificate statute relating to expiration, escheatment, reissuance and refund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2024-03-26 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/26/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES