RI H7528 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Powers And Operations (would Limit The Amount Of Recovery By A Person Or Entity Who Purchases Revolving Loans Or Credit Card Debt.)
Title
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Powers And Operations (would Limit The Amount Of Recovery By A Person Or Entity Who Purchases Revolving Loans Or Credit Card Debt.)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7528.pdf |