RI H7533 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Rhode Island Public Transit Authority to alter bus route 58.
Title
Rhode Island Public Transit Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2022) |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7533.pdf |