RI H7627 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Feasibility Of Utilizing Federal Title Iv Dollars To Support And Enhance Enrollment In Social Work Education At Ric (creates A 12-member Commission To Study The Feasibility Of Utilizing Federal Title Iv-e Dollars To Enroll Students In The Field Of Social Work, And Who Would Report Back To The House And Governor By October 1, 2024, And Expire On January 24, 2025.)
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE FEASIBILITY OF UTILIZING FEDERAL TITLE IV DOLLARS TO SUPPORT AND ENHANCE ENROLLMENT IN SOCIAL WORK EDUCATION AT RIC (Creates a 12-member commission to study the feasibility of utilizing Federal Title IV-E dollars to enroll students in the field of social work, and who would report back to the House and Governor by October 1, 2024, and expire on January 24, 2025.)
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7627.pdf |