RI H7663 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- VITAL RECORDS - Requires the division of vital records to ensure that the records are accessible to the local registrars and grant local registrars the authority to issue certified copies of certificates and records.
Title
Requires the division of vital records to ensure that the records are accessible to the local registrars and grant local registrars the authority to issue certified copies of certificates and records.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
Rep. Alex Finkelman [D] | Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7663.pdf |