RI H7672 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS - Effective July 1, 2024, entitles environmental police officers to the benefits provided by chapter 45-21.2 entitled "Optional retirement for members of police force and firefighters."
Title
Effective July 1, 2024, entitles environmental police officers to the benefits provided by chapter 45-21.2 entitled "Optional retirement for members of police force and firefighters."
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] | Rep. Alex Finkelman [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Public Officers And Employees
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7672.pdf |