RI H7749 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- AUTOMATED LICENSE PLATE READERS - Provides for municipal and state police authorities to acquire and to utilize automated license plate readers. Further, the act identifies what data may be collected and in what ways the data can be used.
Title
Provides for municipal and state police authorities to acquire and to utilize automated license plate readers. Further, the act identifies what data may be collected and in what ways the data can be used.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7749.pdf |