RI H7798 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- STALKING - Makes it a misdemeanor to harass another person by following them and using an electronic device to record their movements in any public or private place.
Title
Makes it a misdemeanor to harass another person by following them and using an electronic device to record their movements in any public or private place.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7798.pdf |