RI H7832 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- SEXUAL OFFENDER REGISTRATION AND COMMUNITY NOTIFICATION - Allows the sexual offender board of review to use, in addition to applicable validated risk assessment tools, a structured professional judgment approach to determine the level of risk a registered sex offender poses to the community.
Title
Allows the sexual offender board of review to use, in addition to applicable validated risk assessment tools, a structured professional judgment approach to determine the level of risk a registered sex offender poses to the community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7832.pdf |