RI H7844 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/14/2024)
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/14/2024)
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATERS AND NAVIGATION -- COASTAL RESOURCES MANAGEMENT COUNCIL - Replaces the coastal resources management council with a state department of coastal resources and transfers all of the powers and duties between the two (2) authorities.
Title
Replaces the coastal resources management council with a state department of coastal resources and transfers all of the powers and duties between the two (2) authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/14/2024) |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7844.pdf |