RI H7882 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services (eohhs) To Create A Covid-19 Surge Plan For Handling The Increasing Need For Behavioral Health Services And Substance Use Disorder Treatments
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services (eohhs) To Create A Covid-19 Surge Plan For Handling The Increasing Need For Behavioral Health Services And Substance Use Disorder Treatments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7882.pdf |