RI H7935 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- NEWPORT AND BRISTOL COUNTY CONVENTION AND VISITORS' BUREAU - Makes various amendments to the chapter creating the Newport and Bristol County Convention and Visitors Bureau.
Title
Makes various amendments to the chapter creating the Newport and Bristol County Convention and Visitors Bureau.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-18 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- NEWPORT AND BRISTOL COUNTY CONVENTION AND VISITORS' BUREAU
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- NEWPORT AND BRISTOL COUNTY CONVENTION AND VISITORS' BUREAU
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7935.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7935A.pdf |