RI H7949 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- SUBDIVISION OF LAND - Makes amendments to various provisions relative to subdivision of land review, review stages, special provisions related to development and the procedures for approvals from various permitting authorities.
Title
Makes amendments to various provisions relative to subdivision of land review, review stages, special provisions related to development and the procedures for approvals from various permitting authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 6 N: 60 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 6 N: 60 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |