RI H7958 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- MULTIFAMILY HOUSING ACT - Requires single-family residential zoning in municipalities with populations of over 20,000 to allow middle housing and mandates that those municipalities adopt zoning regulations for middle housing.
Title
Requires single-family residential zoning in municipalities with populations of over 20,000 to allow middle housing and mandates that those municipalities adopt zoning regulations for middle housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-22 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7958.pdf |