RI H8011 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sheriffs from charging/accepting fees from any Rhode Island law enforcement agency for service of any temporary or 1-yr extreme risk protection order. Requires sheriffs to accept petitions/summons, by email, facsimile or other electronic means.
Title
Extreme Risk Protection Orders
Sponsors
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8011.pdf |