RI H8014 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- RHODE ISLAND UNIFORM COMMERCIAL DRIVER'S LICENSE ACT - Provides that commercial driver instruction include industry-specific training on the recognition, prevention, and reporting of human trafficking.
Title
Provides that commercial driver instruction include industry-specific training on the recognition, prevention, and reporting of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Motor And Other Vehicles
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- RHODE ISLAND UNIFORM COMMERCIAL DRIVER'S LICENSE ACT
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- RHODE ISLAND UNIFORM COMMERCIAL DRIVER'S LICENSE ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8014.pdf |