RI H8032 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/02/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 House Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/02/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 House Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- SALES AND USE TAXES - Amends tax law on renewable energy products to exempt certain additional products from sales tax including battery energy storage system equipment, if supplied by a manufacturer of solar photovoltaic equipment.
Title
Amends tax law on renewable energy products to exempt certain additional products from sales tax including battery energy storage system equipment, if supplied by a manufacturer of solar photovoltaic equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8032.pdf |