RI H8055 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CORPORATIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, AND PARTNERSHIPS -- RHODE ISLAND BUSINESS CORPORATION ACT - Allows the sharing of certain information between the division of taxation and the secretary of state's office regarding an entity's tax status as compliant or non-compliant.
Title
Allows the sharing of certain information between the division of taxation and the secretary of state's office regarding an entity's tax status as compliant or non-compliant.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Voas [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Corporations, Associations, And Partnerships
CORPORATIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, AND PARTNERSHIPS -- RHODE ISLAND BUSINESS CORPORATION ACT
CORPORATIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, AND PARTNERSHIPS -- RHODE ISLAND BUSINESS CORPORATION ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8055.pdf |