RI H8145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Task Force To Improve The Long-term Outcomes And Reduce Recidivism Of Females Within The Criminal Justice Population (this Resolution Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Task Force To Improve Long-term Outcomes And Reduce Recidivism Of Females In The Criminal Justice System, From February 5, 2024, To May 3, 2024, And Would Expire On June 7, 2024.)
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE TASK FORCE TO IMPROVE THE LONG-TERM OUTCOMES AND REDUCE RECIDIVISM OF FEMALES WITHIN THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE POPULATION (This resolution extends the reporting and expiration dates of the task force to improve long-term outcomes and reduce recidivism of females in the criminal justice system, from February 5, 2024, to May 3, 2024, and would expire on June 7, 2024.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8145.pdf |