RI H8200 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Town of Jamestown to issue not more than $2,900,000 bonds and notes to finance various improvements at the town of Jamestown's golf course and facilities and related equipment.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Jamestown To Issue General Obligation Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed $2,900,000 To Finance New Construction, Demolition, Renovations And/or Improvements To Jamestown Golf Course And Facilities At 245 Conanicus Avenue And Related Equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2018) |
2018-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |