RI S0043 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state to reimburse the city or town for any costs associated with transporting children placed in foster care to an educational facility outside the regional transportation district.
Title
Residence Of Children For School Purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0043.pdf |