RI S0093 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To "an Act To Create The Bristol County Water Authority And To Provide For It's Powers And Duties" (would Amend The Bristol County Water Authority Act By Specifying How By-laws May Be Amended And How Directors, Officers And Employees May Serve.)
Title
An Act Relating To "an Act To Create The Bristol County Water Authority And To Provide For It's Powers And Duties" (would Amend The Bristol County Water Authority Act By Specifying How By-laws May Be Amended And How Directors, Officers And Employees May Serve.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-07 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-04-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/21/2013) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2013) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |