RI S0116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- School Committees And Superintendents (would Allow School Districts To Use Longer School Days To Educate Students During The School Year, And To Do So In Less Than 180 Days, So Long As The Total Amount Of School Hours Provided At A Minimum Was 1080 School Hours Per School Year)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- School Committees And Superintendents (would Allow School Districts To Use Longer School Days To Educate Students During The School Year, And To Do So In Less Than 180 Days, So Long As The Total Amount Of School Hours Provided At A Minimum Was 1080 School Hours Per School Year)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2013) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2013) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |