RI S0156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the position of a state-designated ombudsperson for services for intellectually/developmentally disabled individuals.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0156.pdf |