RI S0172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires employers with 100 employees to yearly submit a form to the department of labor and training, which contains information regarding the compensation and hours worked of employees by age, gender, race, ethnicity, job category and occupation title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Pay Data Collection And Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07HouseReferred to House Labor
2019-06-06SenateSenate read and passed
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019)
2019-05-29SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019)
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback