RI S0174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the hourly minimum wage effective January 2, 2020 to eleven dollars and fifty cents ($11.50) per hour and effective January 1, 2021, to twelve dollars and fifty cents ($12.50) per hour.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Wages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Minimum wages approval of amendment (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseReferred to House Labor
2019-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-11SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019)
2019-03-13SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2019)
2019-03-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback