RI S0182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of Coventry to combine voting precincts for a special election for the school committee in 2019. Once the precincts are combined, the canvassers shall advertise such combination at least seven (7) days prior to the election.
Title
Election And Qualifications Of Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-07 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/07/2019) |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |