RI S0216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for a nurse to delegate tasks to certified nursing assistants and authorizes the department of health to promulgate regulations that delineate delegable tasks.
Title
Registration Of Nursing Assistants
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0216.pdf |