RI S0225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a state corporate income tax deduction to allowable income for federal tax purposes for investment property held for at least seven (7) years.
Title
Definition Of Corporate Net Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0225.pdf |