RI S0243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows mobile and manufactured homes which are a part of a mobile and manufactured home park to be counted as low and moderate income housing for purposes of compliance with the requirements of the city's or town's comprehensive land use plan.
Title
Low And Moderate Income Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0243.pdf |