RI S0251 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires parole board members be appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate.
Title
Parole Board
Sponsors
Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0251.pdf |