RI S0260 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts natural hair braiders from licensing requirements for hairdressers or cosmeticians, defines natural hair braiding and imposes fines for violations.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Estheticians
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |