RI S0274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state employees and correctional officers who have served under both pension systems to combine their service time earned from each job.
Title
Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |