RI S0288 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the seven million ($7,000,000) dollar limit allowing the motion picture production company tax credit to be carried forward. Increases the total credits that may be issued up to twenty five million ($25,000,000.)
Title
Motion Picture Production Tax Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0288.pdf |