RI S0295 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the automatic phase out of the nursing facility reimbursement price based methodology.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0295.pdf |