RI S0305 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Checking Accounts (would Prohibit Regulated Financial Institutions From Charging An Overdraft Fee In Excess Of The Overdraft Amount. It Would Also Prohibit The Charging Of A Daily Overdraft Fee For Each Day That A Checking Account Is Overdrawn.)
Title
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Checking Accounts (would Prohibit Regulated Financial Institutions From Charging An Overdraft Fee In Excess Of The Overdraft Amount. It Would Also Prohibit The Charging Of A Daily Overdraft Fee For Each Day That A Checking Account Is Overdrawn.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (02/28/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0305.pdf |