RI S0323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits campaign funds to be used to pay all childcare expenses that are incurred as a direct result of campaign activity.
Title
Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |