RI S0333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Raises amount from $1,500 to $3,000 at which insurer may fail to renew private passenger auto policy/assess premium surcharge for property damage claim payment. Eff. 1/1/20.
Title
Casualty Insurance Rating
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |