RI S0335 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that police officers qualify in the use of firearms two (2) times per year instead of one time annually and correction officers qualify annually under lowlight/no light conditions.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0335.pdf |