RI S0369 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property -- Recording Of Instruments: would authorize recording officers to charge a rate of one dollar ($1.00) for each page after the first page or fraction over on attachments, executions, and mechanics' lien accounts
Title
An Act Relating To Property -- Recording Of Instruments
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-06-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-22 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-21 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-21 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0369.pdf |