RI S0369 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the Rhode Island cesspool act of 2007 by phasing out cesspools.
Title
The Rhode Island Cesspool Act Of 2007
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-05-28 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/27/2015) |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2015) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee heard |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |