RI S0402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes certain student privacy rights in regard to take-home technology devices from school.
Title
Protecting Student Privacy On School-owned Technology
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0402.pdf |