RI S0409 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-04 - Meeting postponed (06/06/2023)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-04 - Meeting postponed (06/06/2023)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits on-duty/off-duty law enforcement officer from utilizing any robot/police robot dog/UAV, whether armed/unarmed, within the scope of their employment as well as police departments from purchase/procurement of any robots/UVAs/police robot dogs.
Title
Prohibition On The Use Of Police Robot Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-04 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/06/2023) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0409.pdf |