RI S0456 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that when calculating the income for Federal income tax purposes, there may be subtracted from Federal adjusted gross income up to $15,000 of the taxable portion of the retirement income provided in a taxpayer's Federal income tax return.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0456.pdf |